Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 10/6/2022 7:36:22 PM
Thursday, October 6, 2022
Thursday, October 6, 2022
Other
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Change made: October 6, 2022 9:56 AM - HEARING ADDED
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board - Other
October 13, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Further discussion of the Draft Blueprint Comprehensive Implementation Plan.

Maryland Community Health Resources Commission
Change made: October 6, 2022 4:05 PM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Community Health Resources Commission - Other
October 13, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom Meeting
Meeting of the Maryland Community Health Resources Commission

Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports
Change made: October 6, 2022 4:12 PM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports - Other
October 13, 2022 12:00 PM
Zoom Meeting
Meeting of the Data Collection/Analysis Subcommittee of the Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports

Change made: October 6, 2022 5:04 PM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports - Other
October 17, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom Meeting
Meeting of the Framework, Design & RFP Subcommittee of the Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports

Change made: October 6, 2022 4:21 PM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports - Other
October 18, 2022 9:30 AM
Virtual/In Person Meeting
Meeting of the Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports (Consortium)

Change made: October 6, 2022 4:36 PM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports - Other
October 20, 2022 12:00 PM
Zoom Meeting
Meeting of the Data Collection/Analysis Subcommittee of the Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports

Change made: October 6, 2022 4:57 PM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports - Other
October 26, 2022 10:00 AM
Zoom Meeting
Meeting of the Framework, Design & RFP Subcommittee of the Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports

Change made: October 6, 2022 4:42 PM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports - Other
October 27, 2022 12:00 PM
Zoom Meeting
Meeting of the Data Collection/Analysis Subcommittee of the Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports

Change made: October 6, 2022 5:00 PM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports - Other
November 2, 2022 12:00 PM
Zoom Meeting
Meeting of the Framework, Design & RFP Subcommittee of the Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports

Change made: October 6, 2022 4:51 PM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports - Other
November 3, 2022 12:00 PM
Zoom Meeting
Meeting of the Data Collection/Analysis Subcommittee of the Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports

Change made: October 6, 2022 5:08 PM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports - Other
November 9, 2022 10:00 AM
Zoom Meeting
Meeting of the Framework, Design & RFP Subcommittee of the Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports

Change made: October 6, 2022 4:48 PM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports - Other
November 10, 2022 12:00 PM
Zoom Meeting
Meeting of the Data Collection/Analysis Subcommittee of the Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports

Click to return on the top page