Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 1/19/2022 11:14:51 AM
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
House
Economic Matters Committee
Change made: January 19, 2022 10:51 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
January 26, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0274
Del Qi, et al

Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Prices Listed on Dealer Website
ADDED: 10:51 AM

Change made: January 19, 2022 10:52 AM - HEARING ADDED
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
February 2, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0135
Del Love

Environment – Single–Use Plastics – Restrictions
HB0259
Del Love, et al

Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Biometric Identifiers Privacy
HB0270
Del Ebersole, et al

Business Regulation - Innkeepers - Maintenance of Guest Records and Employee Human Trafficking Awareness Training and Policy
HB0295
Del Qi, et al

Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Online Marketplace Disclosure Requirements (INFORM Consumers Act of 2022)
HB0305
Del Kerr

Financial Institutions - Abandoned Property - Notice and Records

Change made: January 19, 2022 10:51 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
February 21, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0280
Washington County Delegation

Washington County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class CT License
ADDED: 10:51 AM
HB0281
Washington County Delegation

Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event Permits for Wineries - Sunset Repeal
ADDED: 10:51 AM

Click to return on the top page