Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 1/19/2022 12:29:09 PM
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
House
Economic Matters Committee
Change made: January 19, 2022 10:51 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
January 26, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0274
Del Qi, et al

Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Prices Listed on Dealer Website
ADDED: 10:51 AM

Change made: January 19, 2022 10:52 AM - HEARING ADDED
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
February 2, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0135
Del Love

Environment – Single–Use Plastics – Restrictions
HB0259
Del Love, et al

Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Biometric Identifiers Privacy
HB0270
Del Ebersole, et al

Business Regulation - Innkeepers - Maintenance of Guest Records and Employee Human Trafficking Awareness Training and Policy
HB0295
Del Qi, et al

Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Online Marketplace Disclosure Requirements (INFORM Consumers Act of 2022)
HB0305
Del Kerr

Financial Institutions - Abandoned Property - Notice and Records

Change made: January 19, 2022 10:51 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
February 21, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0280
Washington County Delegation

Washington County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class CT License
ADDED: 10:51 AM
HB0281
Washington County Delegation

Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event Permits for Wineries - Sunset Repeal
ADDED: 10:51 AM

Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: January 19, 2022 11:35 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 2, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0217
Dels Love and Ruth

Task Force on Recycling Policy and Recycling and Waste Systems in Maryland
ADDED: 11:35 AM
HB0221
Del Thiam

Natural Resources – Healing Hunting and Fishing Fund – No–Cost Licenses and Stamps
ADDED: 11:35 AM
HB0248
Del Stewart

Legionnaires' Disease Prevention Act
ADDED: 11:35 AM
HB0250
Del Stewart

Private Well Safety Act of 2022
ADDED: 11:35 AM
HB0263
Del Grammer

Real Property – Nuisance Actions – Rodent Harborage
ADDED: 11:35 AM
HB0303
Del Stein

Public Safety - Maryland Swimming Pool and Spa Standards - Adoption
ADDED: 11:35 AM
HB0307
Del Lierman

Environment - Packaging Materials - Producer Responsibility
ADDED: 11:35 AM

Change made: January 19, 2022 11:35 AM - HEARING ADDED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 3, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0206
Del Moon

Vehicle Laws – Licenses and Permits – Prohibited Acts
HB0222
Del Parrott

Vehicle Laws - Driving in Right-Hand Lanes - Interstate Highways in Rural Areas
HB0230
Del Carr, et al

Speed Monitoring Systems - Exclusion of Vehicle Rental Companies - Repeal and Notification Requirement
HB0254
Del Palakovich Carr, et al

State Highway Administration - Pedestrian and Bicyclist Fatalities - Infrastructure Review (Vision Zero Implementation Act of 2022)
HB0264
Del Guyton

Speed Monitoring Systems - School Zones - Nursery Schools
HB0283
Del D. Jones

Vehicle Laws - School Bus Safety - Occupant Capacity

Judiciary Committee
Change made: January 19, 2022 11:21 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
January 25, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0207
Del Attar

Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Crime Involving a Handgun
REMOVED: 11:21 AM

Click to return on the top page