Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 1/19/2022 8:47:13 PM
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
Senate
Budget and Taxation Committee
Change made: January 19, 2022 3:59 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
January 25, 2022 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0228
Sen Ferguson

Maryland Corps Program – Revisions
REMOVED: 3:59 PM

Finance Committee
Change made: January 19, 2022 3:13 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Voting Session
January 20, 2022 3:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0191
Chr FIN (Dept)

Maryland Department of Commerce - Transparency and Efficiency in Reporting Act
ADDED: 3:13 PM
SB0205
Chr FIN (Dept)

Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Sunset Extension
ADDED: 3:13 PM
SB0213
Chr FIN (Dept)

State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors – Sunset Extension
ADDED: 3:13 PM
SB0219
Chr FIN (Dept)

Office of Cemetery Oversight – Sunset Extension
ADDED: 3:13 PM

Judicial Proceedings Committee
Change made: January 19, 2022 1:17 PM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Voting Session
January 21, 2022 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

House
Economic Matters Committee
Change made: January 19, 2022 3:30 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
January 25, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0072
Del Charkoudian

Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law – Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act)
REMOVED: 3:30 PM

Change made: January 19, 2022 10:51 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
January 26, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0274
Del Qi, et al

Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Prices Listed on Dealer Website
ADDED: 10:51 AM

Change made: January 19, 2022 3:16 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
January 27, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0266
Del Crosby

Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance – Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage – Opt–Out Option
ADDED: 3:16 PM

Change made: January 19, 2022 3:16 PM - HEARING ADDED
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
February 1, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0008
Del Valderrama

Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022)
HB0299
The Spkr (Atty Gen Ofc)

Labor and Employment - Employment Standards and Conditions - Definition of Employer

Change made: January 19, 2022 10:52 AM - HEARING ADDED
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
February 2, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0135
Del Love

Environment – Single–Use Plastics – Restrictions
HB0259
Del Love, et al

Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Biometric Identifiers Privacy
HB0270
Del Ebersole, et al

Business Regulation - Innkeepers - Maintenance of Guest Records and Employee Human Trafficking Awareness Training and Policy
HB0295
Del Qi, et al

Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Online Marketplace Disclosure Requirements (INFORM Consumers Act of 2022)
HB0305
Del Kerr

Financial Institutions - Abandoned Property - Notice and Records

Change made: January 19, 2022 3:16 PM - HEARING ADDED
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
February 3, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0031
Del Charkoudian

Maryland Energy Administration – Resiliency Hub Grant Program and Fund
HB0088
Del Charkoudian

Public Utilities - Energy Distribution Planning and Required Labor Standards

Change made: January 19, 2022 3:16 PM - HEARING ADDED
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
February 8, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0004
Del Watson

Unemployment Insurance – Recovery of Benefits – Refund of Payments
HB0234
Del Palakovich Carr

Unemployment Insurance – Notice of Earned Income Tax Credits for Unemployment Insurance Claimants
HB0253
Del Palakovich Carr, et al

Unemployment Insurance – Federal Extended Benefits for Long–Term Unemployment

Change made: January 19, 2022 10:51 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
February 21, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0280
Washington County Delegation

Washington County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class CT License
ADDED: 10:51 AM
HB0281
Washington County Delegation

Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event Permits for Wineries - Sunset Repeal
ADDED: 10:51 AM

Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: January 19, 2022 11:35 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 2, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0217
Dels Love and Ruth

Task Force on Recycling Policy and Recycling and Waste Systems in Maryland
ADDED: 11:35 AM
HB0221
Del Thiam

Natural Resources – Healing Hunting and Fishing Fund – No–Cost Licenses and Stamps
ADDED: 11:35 AM
HB0248
Del Stewart

Legionnaires' Disease Prevention Act
ADDED: 11:35 AM
HB0250
Del Stewart

Private Well Safety Act of 2022
ADDED: 11:35 AM
HB0263
Del Grammer

Real Property – Nuisance Actions – Rodent Harborage
ADDED: 11:35 AM
HB0303
Del Stein

Public Safety - Maryland Swimming Pool and Spa Standards - Adoption
ADDED: 11:35 AM
HB0307
Del Lierman

Environment - Packaging Materials - Producer Responsibility
ADDED: 11:35 AM

Change made: January 19, 2022 11:35 AM - HEARING ADDED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 3, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0206
Del Moon

Vehicle Laws – Licenses and Permits – Prohibited Acts
HB0222
Del Parrott

Vehicle Laws - Driving in Right-Hand Lanes - Interstate Highways in Rural Areas
HB0230
Del Carr, et al

Speed Monitoring Systems - Exclusion of Vehicle Rental Companies - Repeal and Notification Requirement
HB0254
Del Palakovich Carr, et al

State Highway Administration - Pedestrian and Bicyclist Fatalities - Infrastructure Review (Vision Zero Implementation Act of 2022)
HB0264
Del Guyton

Speed Monitoring Systems - School Zones - Nursery Schools
HB0283
Del D. Jones

Vehicle Laws - School Bus Safety - Occupant Capacity

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: January 19, 2022 2:46 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
January 19, 2022 2:50 PM
(Previous Date/Time: January 19, 2022 2:30 PM)
Zoom / YouTube
HB0044
Dels Hornberger and Reilly

Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Emergency Service Transporters – Reimbursement
HB0049
Del Johnson

Public Health – Emergency and Allergy Treatment Program – Nurse Practitioners
HB0080
Del Cullison

Home- and Community-Based Services Waiver - Participation and Applications
HB0109
Del Shetty

Maryland Department of Health – System for Newborn Screening – Requirements
HB0178
Dels Chang and Krimm

Public Health – Cottage Food Businesses – Annual Revenues

Judiciary Committee
Change made: January 19, 2022 11:21 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
January 25, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0207
Del Attar

Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Crime Involving a Handgun
REMOVED: 11:21 AM

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: January 19, 2022 4:04 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 1, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0036
Del Attar

Vehicle Excise Tax - Leased Vehicles - Alteration
ADDED: 4:04 PM
HB0285
Del D. Jones

Property Tax Credit - Disabled Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers - Federal Police and Criminal Investigators
ADDED: 4:04 PM
HB0291
Del Kaiser

Election Law - Contested Elections
ADDED: 4:04 PM
HB0302
Del Stein

Baltimore County – Property Tax – Credit for Homeowners Who Have Suffered a Hardship
ADDED: 4:04 PM

Other
Frederick
Change made: January 19, 2022 2:18 PM - HEARING ADDED
Frederick - Other
January 21, 2022 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube

Change made: January 19, 2022 2:19 PM - HEARING ADDED
Frederick - Other
January 28, 2022 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube

Click to return on the top page