Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 2/7/2023 9:39:39 AM
Tuesday, February 7, 2023
Tuesday, February 7, 2023
House
Capital Budget Subcommittee
Change made: February 7, 2023 9:19 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Capital Budget Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 15, 2023 4:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Department of State Police
REMOVED: 9:19 AM

Change made: February 7, 2023 9:20 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Capital Budget Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 22, 2023 4:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Department of State Police
ADDED: 9:20 AM

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: February 7, 2023 9:35 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 22, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB0475
Del Rosenberg

Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact
ADDED: 9:35 AM

Change made: February 7, 2023 9:35 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 1, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB0475
Del Rosenberg

Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact
REMOVED: 9:35 AM

Click to return on the top page