Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 11/29/2021 9:27:42 PM
Monday, November 29, 2021
Monday, November 29, 2021
Senate
Reapportionment and Redistricting
Change made: November 29, 2021 1:37 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Reapportionment and Redistricting - Bill Hearing
November 29, 2021 1:37 PM
(Previous Date/Time: November 29, 2021 2:00 PM)
Zoom / YouTube
SB2000
Sen Augustine

OIS Test

Other
Assessment and Funding of School Facilities, Workgroup on the
Change made: November 29, 2021 10:04 AM - HEARING ADDED
Assessment and Funding of School Facilities, Workgroup on the - Other
December 1, 2021 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Change made: November 29, 2021 10:05 AM - HEARING ADDED
Assessment and Funding of School Facilities, Workgroup on the - Other
December 15, 2021 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Change made: November 29, 2021 1:00 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board - Other
November 29, 2021 1:01 PM
(Previous Date/Time: November 29, 2021 1:00 PM)
Zoom / YouTube
Briefing on the Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education's work and recommendations.

House Cannabis Referendum and Legalization Workgroup
Change made: November 29, 2021 8:02 AM - HEARING UPDATED
House Cannabis Referendum and Legalization Workgroup - Other
December 1, 2021 10:00 AM
(Previous Date/Time: December 1, 2021 1:00 PM)
Zoom / YouTube
Presentation and Discussion on Cannabis and Taxation.

Oral Health in Maryland, Task Force on
Change made: November 29, 2021 8:46 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Oral Health in Maryland, Task Force on - Other
December 2, 2021 4:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Presentation from Chelsea Fosse, DMD MPH, Senior Health Policy Analyst, American Dental Association Health Policy Institute.
ADDED: 8:46 PM

Click to return on the top page