Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 11/30/2021 4:49:57 PM
Friday, September 17, 2021
Friday, September 17, 2021
Other
Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission
Change made: September 17, 2021 4:18 PM - HEARING ADDED
Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission - Other
September 29, 2021 5:00 PM to September 29, 2021 7:00 PM
Remote Stream Location / YouTube
Legislative Redistricting

Change made: September 17, 2021 4:41 PM - HEARING ADDED
Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission - Other
September 30, 2021 6:00 PM to September 30, 2021 8:00 PM
Remote Stream Location / YouTube
Legislative Redistricting

Change made: September 17, 2021 5:00 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission - Other
October 5, 2021 3:00 PM to October 5, 2021 5:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
(Previous Location: Remote Stream Location / YouTube)
Legislative Redisticting

Click to return on the top page