Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 12/1/2021 9:52:38 PM
Friday, September 10, 2021
Friday, September 10, 2021
House
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee
Change made: September 10, 2021 4:43 PM - HEARING ADDED
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Other
September 14, 2021 1:00 PM
Site Visit

Other
Economic Stability, House Study Group on
Change made: September 10, 2021 12:24 PM - HEARING ADDED
Economic Stability, House Study Group on - Other
September 29, 2021 2:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Discuss plans for the 2022 Session.

Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission
Change made: September 10, 2021 2:54 PM - HEARING ADDED
Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission - Other
September 20, 2021 6:00 PM to September 20, 2021 8:00 PM
Remote Stream Location / YouTube
Legislative Redistricting

Oral Health in Maryland, Task Force on
Change made: September 10, 2021 11:57 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Oral Health in Maryland, Task Force on - Other
September 14, 2021 2:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Introduction and Presentation by Nancy Brown, Division Chief of Evaluation, Research, and Data Analytics, Maryland Medicaid Office of Innovation, Research, and Development.
ADDED: 11:57 AM

Click to return on the top page