Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 11/26/2021 10:24:56 PM
Thursday, September 9, 2021
Thursday, September 9, 2021
House
Health and Social Services Subcommittee
Change made: September 9, 2021 9:18 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Health and Social Services Subcommittee - Other
September 14, 2021 2:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD

Change made: September 9, 2021 9:42 AM - HEARING ADDED
Health and Social Services Subcommittee - Other
September 14, 2021 2:00 PM
Site Visit
Additional presentations at the site by Baltimore Crisis Response, Inc., Behavioral Health System Maryland, and Serving Together.

Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee
Change made: September 9, 2021 9:18 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee - Other
September 14, 2021 2:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD

Change made: September 9, 2021 9:38 AM - HEARING ADDED
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee - Other
September 14, 2021 2:00 PM
Site Visit

Other
Health Equity Resource Community (HERC) Advisory Committee
Change made: September 9, 2021 1:24 PM - HEARING ADDED
Health Equity Resource Community (HERC) Advisory Committee - Other
September 15, 2021 8:30 AM
Zoom Meeting
Meeting of the Pathways Call for Proposals/Design Subcommittee

Change made: September 9, 2021 1:15 PM - HEARING ADDED
Health Equity Resource Community (HERC) Advisory Committee - Other
September 16, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom Meeting
Meeting of the Data & Program Evaluation Subcommittee.

Maryland Medicaid Advisory Committee
Change made: September 9, 2021 1:31 PM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Medicaid Advisory Committee - Other
September 23, 2021 1:00 PM to September 23, 2021 3:00 PM
Webex-Teleconference

Click to return on the top page