Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 10/24/2021 9:47:03 AM
Tuesday, August 24, 2021
Tuesday, August 24, 2021
Other
Board of Public Works
Change made: August 24, 2021 11:30 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Board of Public Works - Other
September 15, 2021 10:00 AM
(Previous Date/Time: September 22, 2021 10:00 AM)
Virtual/In Person Meeting
General Meeting

Canine Breeding Facilities and Sourcing Standards, Task Force to Study
Change made: August 24, 2021 1:59 PM - HEARING ADDED
Canine Breeding Facilities and Sourcing Standards, Task Force to Study - Other
September 29, 2021 10:30 AM
Zoom Meeting
Second Meeting

Health Equity Resource Community (HERC) Advisory Committee
Change made: August 24, 2021 4:30 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Health Equity Resource Community (HERC) Advisory Committee - Other
August 26, 2021 9:00 AM
Virtual Meeting
(Previous Location: Conference Room Side B, 100 Community Place, Crownsville, MD)
Meeting of the Pathways Calls for Proposals/Design Subcommittee of the Health Equity Resource Communities Advisory Committee.

Joint Committee on Children, Youth, and Families
Change made: August 24, 2021 4:10 PM - HEARING ADDED
Joint Committee on Children, Youth, and Families - Briefing
September 8, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Briefing on economic impacts of the COVID-19 pandemic on women and families.

Click to return on the top page