Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 12/4/2021 2:19:38 PM
Tuesday, August 10, 2021
Tuesday, August 10, 2021
Other
Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness
Change made: August 10, 2021 1:05 PM - HEARING ADDED
Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness - Other
September 9, 2021 1:00 PM to September 9, 2021 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Update on Housing Relief Programs and Evictions

Change made: August 10, 2021 1:07 PM - HEARING ADDED
Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness - Other
October 5, 2021 1:00 PM to October 5, 2021 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Pipeline to Homelessness; Housing as a Driver of Health

Change made: August 10, 2021 1:08 PM - HEARING ADDED
Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness - Other
November 9, 2021 1:00 PM to November 9, 2021 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Legislative and Advocate Updates

Change made: August 10, 2021 1:09 PM - HEARING ADDED
Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness - Other
December 7, 2021 1:00 PM to December 7, 2021 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Recommendations

Click to return on the top page