Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 9/30/2022 5:24:25 AM
Wednesday, August 3, 2022
Wednesday, August 3, 2022
Other
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Change made: August 3, 2022 10:49 AM - HEARING ADDED
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board - Other
August 11, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Blueprint Summer Working Session #5-Pillars 3 (College and Career Readiness) and 4 (Resource Equity)

Change made: August 3, 2022 10:52 AM - HEARING ADDED
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board - Other
August 18, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Blueprint Summer Working Session #6-Pillar 1 (Early Childhood Education)

Capital Debt Affordability Committee
Change made: August 3, 2022 7:39 AM - HEARING ADDED
Capital Debt Affordability Committee - Other
October 11, 2022 10:00 AM
Assembly Room #114-116, Louis L. Goldstein Treasury Bldg., 80 Calvert St., Annapolis, MD
Legislative review, revenue estimates, and the review of capital programs.

Change made: August 3, 2022 7:41 AM - HEARING ADDED
Capital Debt Affordability Committee - Other
October 14, 2022 1:00 PM
Assembly Room #114-116, Louis L. Goldstein Treasury Bldg., 80 Calvert St., Annapolis, MD
Review of tax-supported debt and the size and condition of debt of higher education institutions.

Change made: August 3, 2022 7:42 AM - HEARING ADDED
Capital Debt Affordability Committee - Other
October 19, 2022 10:00 AM
Assembly Room #114-116, Louis L. Goldstein Treasury Bldg., 80 Calvert St., Annapolis, MD
Recommendation of general obligation bond authorizations.

Click to return on the top page