Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 10/7/2022 2:55:41 PM
Friday, July 29, 2022
Friday, July 29, 2022
Other
Board of Public Works
Change made: July 29, 2022 12:38 PM - HEARING ADDED
Board of Public Works - Other
October 12, 2022 10:00 AM
Virtual/In Person Meeting
General Meeting

Change made: July 29, 2022 12:44 PM - HEARING ADDED
Board of Public Works - Other
October 26, 2022 10:00 AM
Virtual/In Person Meeting
General Meeting

Change made: July 29, 2022 12:50 PM - HEARING ADDED
Board of Public Works - Other
November 16, 2022 10:00 AM
Virtual/In Person Meeting
General Meeting

Change made: July 29, 2022 1:36 PM - HEARING ADDED
Board of Public Works - Other
December 7, 2022 10:00 AM
Virtual/In Person Meeting
General Meeting

Change made: July 29, 2022 1:39 PM - HEARING ADDED
Board of Public Works - Other
December 21, 2022 10:00 AM
Virtual/In Person Meeting
General Meeting

Change made: July 29, 2022 1:42 PM - HEARING ADDED
Board of Public Works - Other
January 4, 2023 10:00 AM
Virtual/In Person Meeting
General Meeting

Click to return on the top page