Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 10/4/2022 9:41:18 AM
Monday, June 27, 2022
Monday, June 27, 2022
Other
Board of Public Works
Change made: June 27, 2022 2:58 PM - HEARING ADDED
Board of Public Works - Other
July 6, 2022 10:00 AM
Virtual/In Person Meeting
General Meeting

Change made: June 27, 2022 3:02 PM - HEARING ADDED
Board of Public Works - Other
July 27, 2022 10:00 AM
Virtual/In Person Meeting
General Meeting

Change made: June 27, 2022 3:10 PM - HEARING ADDED
Board of Public Works - Other
August 10, 2022 10:00 AM
Virtual/In Person Meeting
General Meeting

Change made: June 27, 2022 3:13 PM - HEARING ADDED
Board of Public Works - Other
August 31, 2022 10:00 AM
Virtual/In Person Meeting
General Meeting

Change made: June 27, 2022 3:16 PM - HEARING ADDED
Board of Public Works - Other
September 14, 2022 10:00 AM
Virtual/In Person Meeting
General Meeting

Click to return on the top page