Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 10/4/2022 9:23:59 AM
Tuesday, June 7, 2022
Tuesday, June 7, 2022
Other
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Change made: June 7, 2022 11:21 AM - HEARING ADDED
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board - Other
June 16, 2022 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Blueprint Implementation Planning Session - Pillars 3 and 5 - College and Career Readiness and Governance and Accountability

Change made: June 7, 2022 11:25 AM - HEARING ADDED
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board - Other
June 23, 2022 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Blueprint Implementation Planning Session - Pillars 1 and 4 - Early Childhood Education and More Resource to Ensure All Students are Successful

Change made: June 7, 2022 11:32 AM - HEARING ADDED
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board - Other
June 30, 2022 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Board Business Meeting
Blueprint Implementation Planning Session - Pillar 2 - High Quality and Diverse Teachers and Leaders

Click to return on the top page