Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 5/12/2021 12:25:58 AM
Saturday, February 6, 2021
Saturday, February 6, 2021
House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: February 6, 2021 9:34 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 17, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0466
Del Palakovich Carr

Higher Education - Student Identification Cards - Required Information
ADDED: 9:34 AM
HB0485
Del Solomon

Public-Private Partnerships - Process and Oversight
ADDED: 9:34 AM
HB0630
Del Solomon

Primary and Secondary Education – School District Energy Use – Policy and Study
ADDED: 9:34 AM
HB0702
Del Ivey

Higher Education - Standardized Tests - Prohibition of Use in Student Admissions
ADDED: 9:34 AM
HB0718
Del Guyton

State Coordinator for Autism Strategy and Advisory Stakeholder Group on Autism-Related Needs - Mandated Appropriation
ADDED: 9:34 AM
HB0756
Del Krimm

Office of Legislative Audits – Acceptance and Investigation of Allegations of Fraud, Waste, and Abuse
ADDED: 9:34 AM
HB0793
Del Anderton

Local Governments - Income Tax Disparity Grants - Amounts
ADDED: 9:34 AM
HB0813
St. Mary's County Delegation

St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond
ADDED: 9:34 AM
HB0834
Del Metzgar

Public Health – Federal and State Funding for Abortions – Prohibition and Exceptions
ADDED: 9:34 AM
HB0867
Del Smith

Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program Fund
ADDED: 9:34 AM
HB0887
Del Chang

State Debt – Annuity Bond Fund – Use of Bond Premiums
ADDED: 9:34 AM

Change made: February 6, 2021 9:45 AM - HEARING ADDED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 24, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0723
Del Ivey

Public Institutions of Higher Education – Incarcerated and Formerly Incarcerated Individuals – Academic and Employment Opportunities
HB0740
The Spkr (Admin)

Building Opportunity Act of 2021
HB0741
The Spkr (Admin)

Maryland Environmental Service - Officers, Board of Directors, and Responsibilities - Alterations
HB0830
Del Lierman

Community Development Administration - Financial Assistance Programs - Prohibitions
HB0862
St. Mary's County Delegation

St. Mary’s County and Metropolitan Commission – Debt Limitations
HB0922
Del Lierman (Chr Jt Com on Pnsns)

State Retirement and Pension System - COVID-19-Related Death Benefits - Clarification
HB0929
Del Arikan

Teachers’ Pension System – Vested Allowance – Break in Service
HB1003
Del Lierman

States of Emergency - Emergency Procurement and Budget Amendments - Notice and Authorization
HB1055
Del B. Barnes

Capital Budget - Legislative Initiatives - Alterations
HB1099
Del Carr

Historic African American Cemeteries Preservation Fund and Study

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: February 6, 2021 5:35 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 18, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0987
Del Qi

Economic Development – Comprehensive Technical Assistance Program – Establishment
ADDED: 5:35 PM
HB0988
Del Rosenberg

Horse Racing – Development of Pimlico Racing Facility Communities – Memorandum of Understanding
ADDED: 5:35 PM
HB0995
Del Qi

Sales and Use Tax – Restaurant Utilities – Exemption
ADDED: 5:35 PM

Other
Maryland Rural Caucus
Change made: February 6, 2021 6:38 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Rural Caucus - Other
February 11, 2021 8:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
General discussion of events and legislation pertinent to the Maryland Rural Caucus

Change made: February 6, 2021 6:39 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Rural Caucus - Other
March 11, 2021 8:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
General discussion of events and legislation pertinent to the Maryland Rural Caucus

Click to return on the top page