Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 6/1/2023 3:37:11 PM
Sunday, February 5, 2023
Sunday, February 5, 2023
Senate
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Change made: February 5, 2023 6:40 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
February 15, 2023 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0483
Sens Lewis Young and Rosapepe

Private Well Safety Act of 2023
ADDED: 6:40 AM

House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: February 5, 2023 5:41 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 14, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
HB0541
Del Forbes (Chr Jt Com on Pnsns)

State Retirement and Pension System – Nonvested Former Members – Return of Accumulated Contributions
ADDED: 5:41 PM

Change made: February 5, 2023 5:41 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 21, 2023 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
HB0541
Del Forbes (Chr Jt Com on Pnsns)

State Retirement and Pension System – Nonvested Former Members – Return of Accumulated Contributions
REMOVED: 5:41 PM

Click to return on the top page