Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 7/6/2022 12:58:38 AM
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
Senate
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
Change made: January 11, 2022 4:07 PM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Other
January 13, 2022 10:45 AM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Organizational Meeting

Change made: January 11, 2022 4:07 PM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Briefing
January 18, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
The Maryland Department of the Environment and Environmental Enforcement

Change made: January 11, 2022 4:07 PM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
January 18, 2022 2:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0171
Chr EHE (Dept)

Environment - Public Participation Modernization Act
SB0178
Chr EHE (Dept)

Program Open Space - Local Projects - Federal Funds
SB0190
Chr EHE (Dept)

Tidal Fisheries Advisory Commission - Membership Term - Alteration
SB0206
Chr EHE (Dept)

Department of Agriculture - Spay/Neuter Fund - Extension

Change made: January 11, 2022 4:07 PM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
January 19, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0050
Sen Young

Higher Education – Returned Peace Corps Volunteers – In–State Tuition
SB0055
Sen Sydnor

Baltimore County Board of Education – Retention of Counsel
SB0119
Sen Washington

Education – Crimes on School Grounds – Application
SB0124
Sen Hettleman

Public Schools – Grant Program to Reduce and Compost School Waste
SB0157
Sen Carter

Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Student Members and Task Force to Study Compensation
SB0162
Sen Hester

Public Schools – Cyber Safety Guide and Training Course – Development, Implementation, and Reporting
SB0204
Chr EHE (Dept)

State Libraries – Maryland State Library Board – Membership

Change made: January 11, 2022 4:07 PM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
January 20, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0168
Chr EHE (Dept)

Department of Health - ImmuNet and Statewide Advisory Commission on Immunizations
SB0182
Chr EHE (Dept)

State Board of Electricians - Sunset Extension
SB0184
Chr EHE (Dept)

State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air–Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors – Sunset Extension
SB0186
Chr EHE (Dept)

Maryland AIDS Drug Assistance Program – Rebates
SB0193
Chr EHE (Dept)

State Board of Plumbing - Sunset Extension
SB0195
Chr EHE (Dept)

State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - Sunset Extension
SB0199
Chr EHE (Dept)

State Board of Architects - Sunset Extension
SB0202
Chr EHE (Dept)

State Board of Examiners in Optometry - Sunset Extension
SB0209
Chr EHE (Dept)

State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Sunset Extension
SB0211
Chr EHE (Dept)

State Board for Professional Engineers - Sunset Extension

Rules Committee
Change made: January 11, 2022 5:26 PM - HEARING ADDED
Rules Committee - Other
January 12, 2022 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Rules Discussion

House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: January 11, 2022 1:54 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Appropriations Committee - Other
January 13, 2022 11:30 AM
(Previous Date/Time: January 13, 2022 11:00 AM)
Zoom / YouTube

Economic Matters Committee
Change made: January 11, 2022 2:32 PM - HEARING ADDED
Economic Matters Committee - Other
January 13, 2022 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube

Change made: January 11, 2022 4:24 PM - HEARING ADDED
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
January 20, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0057
Del Washington

Motor Vehicle Insurance - Rate Filings - Trade Secrets and Factors Used to Establish Rates
HB0125
Del Shetty

Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Use of Gender
HB0138
Del Charkoudian

Department of Human Services - Electric Universal Service Program - Eligibility

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: January 11, 2022 1:57 PM - HEARING ADDED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
January 19, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Briefing on Total Cost of Care Model

Change made: January 11, 2022 1:57 PM - HEARING ADDED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
January 19, 2022 2:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0044
Dels Hornberger and Reilly

Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Emergency Service Transporters – Reimbursement
HB0049
Del Johnson

Public Health – Emergency and Allergy Treatment Program – Nurse Practitioners
HB0080
Del Cullison

Home- and Community-Based Services Waiver - Participation and Applications
HB0109
Del Shetty

Maryland Department of Health – System for Newborn Screening – Requirements
HB0178
Dels Chang and Krimm

Public Health – Cottage Food Businesses – Annual Revenues

Change made: January 11, 2022 1:57 PM - HEARING ADDED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
January 20, 2022 1:00 PM
Virtual Meeting
Briefing on Hospital Liability and the 2021 HSCRC report

Change made: January 11, 2022 8:58 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
January 25, 2022 2:30 PM
(Previous Date/Time: January 25, 2022 1:00 PM)
Zoom / YouTube
HB0005
Del Krimm

State Government - State and Local Government Employees and Contractors - Cybersecurity Training
HB0177
Dels Bartlett and Wilson

9–1–1 Registry Program – Autism and Other Special Needs – Established
HB0180
Del Bagnall

Interstate Medical Licensure Compact – Sunset Extension and Reporting

Change made: January 11, 2022 1:57 PM - HEARING ADDED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
January 26, 2022 2:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0014
Del Cullison

Health – Advance Care Planning and Advance Directives
HB0032
Del Bagnall

Mental Health Law – Petitions for Emergency Evaluation – Electronic Record
HB0048
Del Belcastro

Public Health - Maryland Suicide Fatality Review Committee
HB0096
Del Shetty

Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ Transplantation - Financial Status

Change made: January 11, 2022 1:57 PM - HEARING ADDED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
January 27, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Briefing on Maryland Department of Health’s Behavioral Health Administrative Service Organization (Optum) Issues

Judiciary Committee
Change made: January 11, 2022 2:18 PM - HEARING ADDED
Judiciary Committee - Briefing
January 27, 2022 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Fiscal Briefing from the Department of Legislative Services

Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee
Change made: January 11, 2022 12:39 PM - HEARING ADDED
Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee - Work Session
January 13, 2022 2:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee
Change made: January 11, 2022 1:57 PM - HEARING ADDED
Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - Briefing
January 17, 2022 1:00 PM
Virtual Meeting
Briefing on the effects of pending settlements on the Opioid Restitution Fund

Click to return on the top page