Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 4/24/2024 9:16:52 AM
Tuesday, January 2, 2024
Tuesday, January 2, 2024
House
Ways and Means Committee
Change made: January 2, 2024 1:15 PM - HEARING ADDED
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
January 23, 2024 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD

Other
Southern Maryland
Change made: January 2, 2024 11:57 AM - HEARING ADDED
Southern Maryland - Other
January 19, 2024 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube

Change made: January 2, 2024 11:58 AM - HEARING ADDED
Southern Maryland - Other
February 2, 2024 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube

Change made: January 2, 2024 12:00 PM - HEARING ADDED
Southern Maryland - Other
February 16, 2024 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube

Change made: January 2, 2024 12:00 PM - HEARING ADDED
Southern Maryland - Other
March 1, 2024 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube

Change made: January 2, 2024 12:00 PM - HEARING ADDED
Southern Maryland - Other
March 15, 2024 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube

Change made: January 2, 2024 12:01 PM - HEARING ADDED
Southern Maryland - Other
March 29, 2024 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube

Click to return on the top page