Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 6/12/2024 3:01:32 PM
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Accountability and Implementation Board Nominating Committee
Created: 6/5/2024 3:51 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Announcement of nominees for the Accountability and Implementation Board.

Maryland Community Health Resources Commission
Created: 6/5/2024 3:16 PM
10:00 AM - Richard Trainor Conference Room, MDOT Headquarters, 7201 Corporate Center Dr., Hanover, MD
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 854 3623 5988 Passcode: 734089 Dial-In #: 301-715-8592
In-Person/Virtual meeting of the Maryland Community Health Resources Commission (CHRC).

Maryland Insurance Administration
Created: 5/15/2024 8:37 AM
1:00 PM to 4:00 PM - 24th Floor Hearing Room, Maryland Insurance Administration, 200 St. Paul Pl., Baltimore
Meeting will be held in person and via Zoom
Meeting Video
Dial-In #: 646-828-7666 US Webinar ID: 160 130 7033
If you plan on providing oral testimony, please RSVP. Written comments may also be submitted. Send written comments and RSVPs to Nancy Muehlberger by June 7, 2024, either by email to longtermcare.mia@maryland.gov or by mail to 200 St. Paul Place, Suite 2700, Baltimore, MD 21202 or by fax to 410-468-2038.
The Maryland Insurance Administration is conducting a public hearing on specific long-term care insurance rate increase requests being made by Allianz Life Insurance Company of North America, LifeSecure Insurance Company, and MedAmerica Insurance Company.
The hearing will provide the opportunity for insurance company officials to explain the rate increases and for the MIA to consider whether the proposals comply with Maryland's laws and regulations relating to long-term care insurance.

Maryland Underground Facilities Damage Prevention Authority
Created: 6/4/2024 11:33 AM
9:00 AM - One Call Center, Suite 104, Lower Level Conference Rm., 7223 Parkway Drive, Hanover, MD
In Person Meeting of Full Authority+Closed Executive Session.

Click to return on the top page