Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 12/1/2022 1:36:43 AM
Thursday, December 1, 2022
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Created: 11/18/2022 1:02 PM
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Discussion and adoption of the Blueprint Comprehensive Implementation Plan and related materials.

Maryland Commission on Artistic Property
Created: 11/27/2022 7:45 AM
10:30 AM - Zoom Meeting
General meeting for discussion of matters related to the state-owned art collection

Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports
Created: 11/3/2022 4:07 PM
12:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
Data Collection/Analysis Subcommittee
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 814 5814 5747 Passcode: 953584 Dial-In #: 301-715-8592
Meeting of the Data Collection/Analysis Subcommittee of the Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports.

Click to return on the top page