Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 8/16/2022 1:14:35 AM
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Maryland Economic Development Commission
Created: 7/5/2022 10:07 AM
12:00 PM - Visit Baltimore, 10th Floor, 400 E. Pratt St., Baltimore, MD
Updates from the Department of Commerce, Office of Tourism and Film and Visit Baltimore.

Maryland Insurance Administration
Created: 7/19/2022 2:34 PM
1:00 PM to 4:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
Meeting Video
If you wish to provide oral testimony or submit written comments contact Nancy Muehlberger by August 9, 2022,
either by email to longtermcare.mia@maryland.gov or by mail to 200 St. Paul Place, Suite 2700, Baltimore, MD 21202
or by fax to 410-468-2038.
For more information on the hearing please click here
The Maryland Insurance Administration will conduct a public hearing via zoom on a specific rate increase request being made by Berkshire Life Insurance Company of America, and Allianz Life Insurance Company of North America.
(Added - 7/20/2022 1:05 PM)
The purpose of the hearing is for insurance company officials to explain the reasons for rate increases, to explain the new benefit options, and for the MIA to consider whether the proposed rate increase is in compliance with Maryland's laws and regulations.
(Added - 7/20/2022 1:05 PM)
The Maryland Insurance Administration will conduct a public hearing via zoom on a specific rate increase request being made by Berkshire Life Insurance Company of America.
(Removed - 7/20/2022 1:05 PM)
The purpose of the hearing is for insurance company officials to explain the reasons for rate increases, to explain the new benefit options, and for the MIA to consider whether the proposed rate increase is in compliance with Maryland's laws and regulations.
(Removed - 7/20/2022 1:05 PM)

Click to return on the top page