Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 12/2/2021 7:25:39 AM
Thursday, December 2, 2021
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Economic Future of Western Maryland, Task Force on
Created: 10/27/2021 3:50 PM
2:00 PM to 3:30 PM - Virtual/In Person Meeting
Meeting Video
Phone Link: 430-901-0349 Phone Access Passcode: 647 250 786#
In person meeting: Frostburg State University, The Hall of Fame Room, Cordts P.E. Center
The meeting will be fully broadcast through the Google Meet Link above. In person attendees must wear masks and check in here
Vote on recommendations for upcoming legislative session and final report.

Maryland Orphans Courts, Task Force to Study
Created: 10/18/2021 2:41 PM
11:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
To view the meeting click here
Meeting to fulfill the mandate of House Bill 681.

Oral Health in Maryland, Task Force on
Created: 11/12/2021 4:22 PM
4:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
For additional information click here
Meeting of the Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland.
Presentation from Chelsea Fosse, DMD MPH, Senior Health Policy Analyst, American Dental Association Health Policy Institute; and Cheryl Lerner DMD, Dental Director, CareFirst BlueCross BlueShield.
(Added - 11/30/2021 10:27 AM)
Presentation from Chelsea Fosse, DMD MPH, Senior Health Policy Analyst, American Dental Association Health Policy Institute.
(Removed - 11/30/2021 10:27 AM)

Click to return on the top page