Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 12/8/2021 5:32:12 PM
Wednesday, December 8, 2021
Senate
Created: 12/7/2021 7:00 PM
Reapportionment and Redistricting - Bill Hearing
9:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Bill hearings are sponsor only.
The Spkr (Legislative Redistricting Advis

Congressional Districting Plan
Sponsor only
Montgomery County Delegation

Montgomery County - Board of Education Residence Districts - Redistricting Plan MC 01-21SS
Sponsor only
Carroll County Delegation

Carroll County - County Commissioner Districts - Redistricting Plan
Sponsor only

House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Joint Committee on Workers' Compensation Benefit and Insurance Oversight
Created: 11/23/2021 3:08 PM
8:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Virtual Briefing from the Uninsured Employers' Fund Board of Directors.

Sports Wagering Application Review Commission
Created: 12/3/2021 12:31 PM
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
The meeting will be live streamed. A link will be provided once the stream begins. Part of the meeting may be closed to the public in accordance with Open Meetings Act procedures.
Click here to see the Commission's webpage for more details.

Click to return on the top page