Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 1/21/2022 8:45:38 AM
Friday, January 21, 2022
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Created: 1/3/2022 3:27 PM
Appropriations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing by the Joint Committee on Cybersecurity, Information Technology, and Biotechnology on the Joint Committee's 2022 funding recommendations
Briefing by the Department of Legislative Services on Executive agency staffing concerns
(Added - 1/9/2022 9:44 AM)

Other
Anne Arundel Live!
Created: 12/30/2021 3:13 PM
8:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Guest-Dr. George Arlotto-Superintendent, Anne Arundel County Public Schools

Baltimore County
Created: 1/18/2022 8:29 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Weekly Bill Hearings: HB192, HB261, HB265

Eastern Shore
Created: 12/29/2021 2:10 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Information and questions and answers from various organizations for members of the Eastern Shore Delegation and their constituents.

Frederick
Created: 1/19/2022 2:18 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube

Montgomery
Created: 1/15/2022 8:03 AM
9:30 AM - Zoom Meeting
Discussion of legislation and other business relevant to Montgomery County.

Click to return on the top page