Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 10/27/2021 6:52:25 PM
Wednesday, October 27, 2021
Senate
Created: 10/4/2021 4:28 PM
Finance Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing: Strategic Energy Investment Fund

House
Created: 10/7/2021 10:00 AM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Other
House Cannabis Referendum and Legalization Workgroup
Created: 9/27/2021 1:39 PM
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Presentation and Discussion on Cannabis and Criminal Justice Impacts.

Click to return on the top page