Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 2/26/2024 4:19:15 PM
Monday, February 26, 2024
Senate
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 1/10/2024 3:55 PM
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 1/10/2024 3:55 PM
Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:00 PM - Miller Senate Building, Schweinhaut Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD

Created: 2/22/2024 4:30 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Work Session
3:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
4:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Information Technology Workgroup
(Added - 2/26/2024 11:01 AM)
Information Technology Workforce
(Removed - 2/26/2024 11:01 AM)

House
Public Safety and Administration Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Created: 1/4/2024 3:24 PM
Public Safety and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 145, Annapolis, MD
Judiciary
(Removed - 1/24/2024 4:22 PM)

Capital Budget Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee) Live!
Created: 1/4/2024 3:44 PM
Capital Budget Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
3:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
(Added - 1/4/2024 4:18 PM)
Department of Disabilities
(Removed - 2/23/2024 4:37 PM)
Department of State Police
(Removed - 2/23/2024 4:37 PM)
Maryland Environmental Service
(Removed - 2/23/2024 4:37 PM)
Military Department
(Removed - 2/23/2024 4:37 PM)

Family Law Subcommittee - (Judiciary Committee)
Created: 2/23/2024 11:47 AM
Family Law Subcommittee - Bill Hearing
3:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Simpson, et al

Marriage – Confidential Communication – Criminal Charge
Del Vogel, et al

Department of Human Services - Children in Foster Care - Luggage
Charles County Delegation

Charles County - Adult Protective Services Review Board - Membership

Public Safety Subcommittee - (Judiciary Committee) Live!
Created: 2/23/2024 1:48 PM
Public Safety Subcommittee - Bill Hearing
4:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
The Spkr (Admin), et al

Criminal Procedure - Victim Compensation - Alterations (Victim Compensation Reform Act of 2024)
The Spkr (Admin), et al

Protecting Election Officials Act of 2024

Created: 2/9/2024 1:05 PM
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Howard County Delegation

Howard County Board of Education - Board Member Terms and Compensation Commission Ho. Co. 2-24
This bill is sponsor only oral testimony
(Added - 2/9/2024 1:18 PM)
Chr W&M

Education - Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Alterations
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Appropriations)
(Added - 2/9/2024 1:18 PM)
Del Atterbeary

Education - Employee Training and Holocaust Education Study - Requirements
(Added - 2/9/2024 1:18 PM)
Del Atterbeary

Early Childhood Education - Publicly Funded Prekindergarten Programs - Alterations
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Appropriations)
(Added - 2/9/2024 1:18 PM)
Del Atterbeary

Internet Gaming - Authorization and Implementation
Montgomery County Delegation

Montgomery County Public Schools - School Personnel Training - Religious Discrimination Prevention MC 22-24
(Removed - 2/23/2024 12:47 PM)

Created: 2/26/2024 10:21 AM
Ways and Means Committee - Voting Session
3:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Voting session to follow today's bill hearings - exact time to be determined.
Del Atterbeary

Property Tax - Transfer to Heir - Payment Plans
Del Charkoudian

Property Tax Credits - Public School Employees, Health and Safety Improvements, and Property Used for Local Housing Programs
Del Attar, et al

Education – Coaches – Mental Health Training
(Jointly assigned to Appropriations\Ways and Means)
Chr W&M (Dept)

County Public Libraries - Overdue Library Materials - Minors
Del Forbes, et al

Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Materials for Individualized Education Program Meetings
The Spkr (Office of the Comptroller)

Individual Tax Preparers - Code of Ethics, Notification of Actions, Enforcement, and Penalties (Stop Scam Tax Preparers Act)
The Spkr (Office of the Comptroller)

Disclosure of Tax Information - Tax Compliance Activity and Binding Data Use Agreements
Del Ruth, et al

Education - Prohibited Behavior on School Grounds and Property - Application
Del Smith

Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center – Student Information – United States Census Bureau
Del Simmons, et al

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Police Auxiliary and Reserve Volunteers
Del Young

Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Application and Reporting Requirements
Del Feldmark

Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Authority

Other
No. 4 - Baltimore County
Created: 2/23/2024 12:23 PM
3:30 PM - Miller Senate Building, Welcome Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD

Click to return on the top page