Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 8/17/2022 3:01:42 AM
Wednesday, August 17, 2022
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Broadening Options and Opportunities for Students Today (BOOST) Advisory Board
Created: 7/26/2022 4:50 PM
2:00 PM to 4:00 PM - 7th Floor Board Room, Nancy S. Grasmick Education Bldg., 200 West Baltimore St., Baltimore, MD
The meeting is open to the public to attend or observe via video conferencing and call-in.
The video conference information is pending and will be posted to the BOOST Program webpage
BOOST Advisory Board to approve a ranked list of eligible applicants and determine the scholarship award amounts.

Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports
Created: 8/9/2022 8:33 AM
10:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 851 8874 4425 Passcode: 727599 Dial-In: 301-715-8592
Orientation Meeting of the Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports (Consortium).

Sports Wagering Application Review Commission
Created: 8/2/2022 10:18 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
The meeting will be livestreamed on YouTube
Part of the meeting may be closed to the public in accordance with Open Meetings Act procedures.
For more details, see the Commission webpage

Click to return on the top page