Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 10/18/2021 9:10:18 PM
Monday, October 18, 2021
Senate
Created: 10/4/2021 12:47 PM
Budget and Taxation Committee
9:45 AM - Site Visit
All day site visit to University of Maryland, College Park Campus, Universities at Shady Grove and RADA Technologies.

House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Capital Debt Affordability Committee
Created: 8/12/2021 11:18 AM
1:00 PM - Assembly Room, 1st Floor, Louis L. Goldstein Treasury Bldg., 80 Calvert St., Annapolis, MD
Recommendation of general obligation bond authorizations.

Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission
Created: 9/20/2021 9:21 AM
6:00 PM to 8:00 PM - Remote Stream Location / YouTube
Eastern Shore Redistricting Hearing
Todd Performing Arts Center, 1000 College Circle, Wye Mills, MD 21679
Meeting Agenda
Guidelines for Public Hearings and Submission of Testimony and Plans
Legislative Redistricting

OIS Testing
Created: 10/18/2021 9:27 AM
6:00 PM - Remote Stream Location / YouTube

Click to return on the top page