Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 9/29/2022 7:33:18 AM
Thursday, September 29, 2022
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Created: 8/30/2022 12:49 PM
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
Tuesday, September 20, 2022 1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing on the 2022 Maryland Primary Election

Other
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Created: 9/19/2022 3:37 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Regular Board Meeting and Pillar 5 Working Session

Oral Health in Maryland, Task Force on
Created: 9/19/2022 11:50 AM
4:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Meeting of the Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland

Click to return on the top page