Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 11/29/2022 9:40:36 AM
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
Senate
Created: 11/29/2022 9:05 AM
Judicial Proceedings Committee
10:30 AM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
**AV Testing**

House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Anne Arundel
Created: 11/28/2022 10:38 AM
4:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Anne Arundel Delegation Meeting
Legislative Bond Initiative Presentations

Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Created: 11/16/2022 11:16 AM
4:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Board Meeting

Maryland Community Health Resources Commission
Created: 11/21/2022 2:31 PM
10:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 825 7591 0588 Passcode: 049147 Dial-In #: 301-715-8592
Meeting of the Maryland Community Health Resources Commission (CHRC)

Click to return on the top page