Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 1/27/2023 12:13:04 AM
Friday, January 27, 2023
Senate
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 1/6/2023 1:06 PM
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
11:30 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Or immediately following session.
Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority
(Removed - 1/16/2023 3:58 PM)

Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 1/6/2023 1:06 PM
Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
11:30 AM - Miller Senate Building, Schweinhaut Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
12:00 PM - Miller Senate Building, Schweinhaut Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Or immediately following session.

Created: 1/19/2023 10:43 AM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube

House
Created: 1/23/2023 10:00 AM
Judiciary Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
Briefing by the Judicial Conference Workgroup on Judicial Elections

Other
Anne Arundel
Created: 1/13/2023 12:06 PM
8:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Anne Arundel County House Delegation Meeting

Baltimore City
Created: 1/25/2023 1:10 PM
9:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
To view the livestream, click here
Special Guest Speaker - State's Attorney Ivan Bates
Bill Hearings:
HB153-Delegate Wells
HB231-Delegate Boyce
HB251-Delegate Boyce
(Removed - 1/25/2023 1:15 PM)
HB 16-Delegate Lewis
(Removed - 1/25/2023 4:27 PM)
HB 116-Delegate Lewis
(Removed - 1/26/2023 2:07 PM)

Baltimore County
Created: 1/24/2023 4:10 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing - Senator Chris Van Hollen
Local Bill Hearings- HB110, HB166, HB175, HB210, HB222, and HB248

Charles
Created: 1/23/2023 12:06 PM
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Legislative Bond Initiatives

Eastern Shore
Created: 1/4/2023 3:08 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Various Topics

Frederick
Created: 1/24/2023 3:34 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Weekly Meeting of Frederick County Delegation

Montgomery
Created: 1/24/2023 11:54 AM
9:15 AM - Zoom Meeting
Discussion of legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation.

Prince George's
Created: 1/23/2023 10:01 AM
9:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
Prince George's County House Delegation Meeting

Southern Maryland
Created: 1/5/2023 4:20 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube

Click to return on the top page