Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 1/20/2022 5:38:57 PM
Thursday, January 20, 2022
Senate
Created: 1/7/2022 4:39 PM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
1:00 pm - Maryland Civic Education Coalition
1:30 pm - Marylanders Against Poverty
2:30 pm - Overview of State Procurement
(Added - 1/12/2022 3:38 PM)
2:00 pm - Overview of State Procurement
(Removed - 1/12/2022 3:38 PM)

Created: 1/11/2022 4:08 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Chr EHE (Dept)

Department of Health - ImmuNet and Statewide Advisory Commission on Immunizations
Chr EHE (Dept)

State Board of Electricians - Sunset Extension
Chr EHE (Dept)

State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air–Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors – Sunset Extension
Chr EHE (Dept)

Maryland AIDS Drug Assistance Program – Rebates
Chr EHE (Dept)

State Board of Plumbing - Sunset Extension
Chr EHE (Dept)

State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - Sunset Extension
Chr EHE (Dept)

State Board of Architects - Sunset Extension
Chr EHE (Dept)

State Board of Examiners in Optometry - Sunset Extension
Chr EHE (Dept)

State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Sunset Extension
Chr EHE (Dept)

State Board for Professional Engineers - Sunset Extension

Created: 1/8/2022 2:26 PM
Finance Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Please see House Judiciary Committee's hearing schedule to watch live on YouTube
Briefing: Hospital Liability and the 2021 HSCRC Report

Created: 1/13/2022 3:37 PM
Finance Committee - Voting Session
3:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Chr FIN (Dept)

Maryland Department of Commerce - Transparency and Efficiency in Reporting Act
(Added - 1/19/2022 3:13 PM)
Chr FIN (Dept)

Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Sunset Extension
(Added - 1/19/2022 3:13 PM)
Chr FIN (Dept)

State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors – Sunset Extension
(Added - 1/19/2022 3:13 PM)
Chr FIN (Dept)

Office of Cemetery Oversight – Sunset Extension
(Added - 1/19/2022 3:13 PM)

Created: 1/5/2022 2:29 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Briefing on the Health Services Cost Review System Liability Report

House
Created: 1/11/2022 4:24 PM
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Washington

Motor Vehicle Insurance - Rate Filings - Trade Secrets and Factors Used to Establish Rates
Del Shetty

Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Use of Gender
Del Charkoudian

Department of Human Services - Electric Universal Service Program - Eligibility

Created: 1/10/2022 11:32 AM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Korman

Maryland Transit Administration - Conversion to Zero-Emission Buses (Zero-Emission Bus Transition Act Revisions)
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Appropriations)
Dels Krimm and Korman

State Highways – Designated Shoulder Areas – Establishment and Use by Transit Buses
Del Fraser-Hidalgo

Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program – Not Subject to Inspection – Fee
Del Fraser-Hidalgo

State Vehicle Fleet - Conversion to Zero-Emission Passenger Cars and Other Light-Duty Vehicles
Del Carr

Ethics – Local Governments – Registration of Lobbyists
Del Healey

Vehicle Laws – Parking Enforcement
Del Healey

Motor Vehicles - Operation When Approaching Disabled Vehicles
Del Thiam

Motor Vehicles – Operation of Dirt Bikes – Prohibited Acts
Del Lehman

Vehicle Laws - Race and Speed Contests - Penalties
Del Attar

Vehicle Excise Tax - Leased Vehicles - Alteration
(Removed - 1/17/2022 3:28 PM)

Housing and Real Property Subcommittee - (Environment and Transportation Committee)
Canceled
Housing and Real Property Subcommittee - Overview
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Local Government and Bi-County Agencies Subcommittee - (Environment and Transportation Committee)
Created: 1/17/2022 1:41 PM
Local Government and Bi-County Agencies Subcommittee - Overview
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Created: 1/11/2022 1:57 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Briefing on Hospital Liability and the 2021 HSCRC report

Created: 1/12/2022 9:01 AM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
4:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
4:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Cullison

State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - Membership and Official Seal
Dels Bhandari and R. Lewis

Pharmacists - Aids for the Cessation of Tobacco Product Use
Del Amprey

Workgroup on Black, Latino, Asian American Pacific Islander, and Other Underrepresented Behavioral Health Professionals
Del Crosby

Health Occupations - Service Members, Veterans, and Military Spouses - Temporary Licensure, Certification, Registration, and Permitting
Del Sample-Hughes

State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, Speech-Language Pathologists, and Music Therapists - Revisions

Created: 1/7/2022 3:26 PM
Judiciary Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing: Hospital Liability and the 2021 HSCRC Report

Created: 12/21/2021 7:54 AM
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Elections Briefing by the State Board of Elections

Created: 1/5/2022 3:24 PM
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Wilson

Public Schools – Expanded American History – Development of Content Standards and Implementation
Del Qi

Education – Educational Interpreter – Certification Requirements
Please Note: Testimony is SPONSOR ONLY.
Del Ruth, et al

Education – Crimes on School Grounds – Application
Please Note: Testimony is SPONSOR ONLY.
Del Bagnall

Anne Arundel County - Board of Education - Meeting Requirements and Officers
Del Bagnall

Commission on Student Behavioral Health and Mental Health Treatment
Del Washington

Public Schools - Student Attendance - Excused Absences for Mental Health Needs
Please Note: Testimony is SPONSOR ONLY.
Del Washington

School Discipline - Data Collection and School Resource Officers
Dels Kerr and Johnson

Education - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Seizure Action Plans (Brynleigh's Act)

Other
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Created: 1/17/2022 1:18 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Business Meeting.

Carroll
Created: 1/13/2022 3:54 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Meeting of the Carroll County House and Senate Delegations
Election of Senate and House Delegation Chairs and Co-Chairs.
Voting on 2022 Legislation
Discussing Legislative Bond Initiatives.

Harford
Created: 1/10/2022 10:51 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Weekly-Harford County House Delegation Meeting

Legislative Policy Committee
Created: 1/10/2022 5:04 PM
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
End of 2021 Interim Items

Montgomery
Created: 1/13/2022 8:12 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
Economic Development Committee
Meeting Video
Discussion of legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation Economic Development Committee.

No. 4 - Baltimore County
Canceled
3:30 PM to 4:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Baltimore County Public School discussion with Superintendent Darryl Williams.

Click to return on the top page