Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 12/6/2021 3:05:46 AM
Monday, December 6, 2021
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Created: 11/22/2021 2:11 PM
Economic Matters Committee - Briefing
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing on discrepancies in home appraisals in Prince George’s County.
Presentations by:
•Maryland Department of Labor;
•Department of Housing and Community Development (invited);
•Maryland Association of Realtors; and
•Prince George’s County Association of Realtors.

Created: 12/2/2021 5:18 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations Committee - Bill Hearing
12:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Joint Hearing with Senate Reapportionment and Redistricting Committee (SB0001, SB0002, SB0003, SB0004)
This Joint Hearing will be Immediately Followed by a Voting Session
The Spkr (Legislative Redistricting Advis

Congressional Districting Plan
The Spkr (Admin)

Congressional Districting Plan
Montgomery County Delegation

Montgomery County - Board of Education Residence Districts - Redistricting Plan MC 01-21SS
Carroll County Delegation

Carroll County - County Commissioner Districts - Redistricting Plan

Other
Montgomery
Created: 12/2/2021 12:53 PM
10:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
Discussion of legislation and other business relevant to Montgomery County.

No. 6 - Montgomery County
Created: 12/5/2021 7:55 PM
10:00 AM - State House Caucus Room, 100 State Circle, Annapolis, MD 21401
Immediately following Session
Voting Session: Montgomery County-Board of Education Residence Districts-MC 01-21SS

Click to return on the top page