Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 1/31/2023 1:58:47 AM
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
Senate
Canceled
Budget and Taxation Committee - Briefing
1:30 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Briefing by MSDE on Payments to Grantees

Created: 1/30/2023 4:32 PM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Voting Session
2:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Bills to be announced.

Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 1/17/2023 11:52 AM
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Briefing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Briefing by the Maryland Family Network
(Added - 1/20/2023 1:59 PM)
Briefing by the Maryland Family Network and MSDE on Child Care in the State
(Removed - 1/20/2023 1:59 PM)

Created: 1/15/2023 6:46 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Energy Policy Overview: Public Service Commission and PJM Interconnection

Created: 1/19/2023 1:15 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
2:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
3:30 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen Feldman

Public Utilities - Energy Efficiency and Conservation Programs - Energy Performance Targets and Low-Income Housing
Sen Augustine

Land Use – Public Service Companies – Pollinator–Friendly Vegetation Management
Sen Feldman

Electricity – Net Energy Metering – Accrual of Net Excess Generation (Net Metering Flexibility Act)
(Removed - 1/25/2023 11:36 AM)

Created: 1/11/2023 12:38 PM
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Sen Augustine

Mental Health – Treatment Plans for Individuals in Facilities – Requirements
Sen Augustine

Health Occupations – Clinical and Graduate Alcohol and Drug Counselors – Licensure
Sen Ellis

Minority Business Enterprise Procurement Contract Financing
Sen Lam

HIV Prevention Drugs - Prescribing and Dispensing by Pharmacists and Insurance Requirements
Sen Jackson

Health Occupations - Service Members, Veterans, and Military Spouses - Temporary Licensure, Certification, Registration, and Permitting
Sen Augustine

Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Collaborative Care Model Services – Implementation and Reimbursement Expansion
Sen Hayes

Business Diversity Incubator Program
Sen Hester

Economic Development – Emergency Relief Program – Established
(Removed - 1/25/2023 10:17 AM)

Created: 1/16/2023 12:55 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen Carozza, et al

Family Law - Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training
Sen West

Child Custody – Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Sen Jackson

Family Law - Marriage Ceremony - Designation of Deputy Clerk
Sen Bailey

Grossly Negligent or Drunk or Drugged Operation of Vehicle or Vessel - Prior Convictions
Sen Beidle

Street Racing and Exhibition Driving - Prohibited Acts, Enforcement, and Penalties
(Added - 1/17/2023 2:07 PM)
Sen Kagan

Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Gender-Inclusive Signage
(Jointly assigned to Judicial Proceedings\Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Sen Kramer

Hate Crimes – Civil Remedy
Sen Carter

Child Custody - Relocation of Child - Expedited Hearing (Assurance of Child's Safety Act)
Sen Sydnor

Evidence – Wiretapping and Electronic Surveillance – Fair Housing Testing
Sens Waldstreicher and Augustine

Safe Access for All (SAFE) Roads Act of 2023
Sen West

Family Law - Grounds for Divorce

House
Created: 1/13/2023 4:45 PM
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Del B. Barnes

Victim Services Programs – Supplementing Federal Funding and Support (Victim Services Stabilization Act)
(Jointly assigned to Appropriations\Judiciary)
(Added - 1/24/2023 10:39 AM)
Del Korman

Transportation – Maryland Rail Authority – Establishment (Maryland Rail Investment Act of 2023)
(Jointly assigned to Appropriations\Environment and Transportation)
Del Otto

Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Crisfield Police Department
(Added - 1/17/2023 9:51 AM)
Del Palakovich Carr

Human Services - Temporary Cash Assistance - Calculation of Benefits
(Added - 1/20/2023 12:59 PM)
Del Bagnall, et al

State Personnel - Whistleblower Law - Procedures and Remedies (First Amendment and Public Employee Protection Act)
Dels S. Johnson and Charkoudian

Education - Public Libraries - Collective Bargaining
Del Solomon

State Personnel - Education and Transportation - Grievance Procedures
(Added - 1/20/2023 12:59 PM)
Del Chang

State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Supervisory and Managerial Employees
(Added - 1/20/2023 12:59 PM)
Del Acevero

Human Services - Universal Basic Income for Transition-Age Youth - Establishment

Created: 1/27/2023 4:19 PM
Economic Matters Committee - Briefing
10:30 AM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
Office of Policy Analysis
DLS Fiscal Briefing

Created: 1/26/2023 12:24 PM
Economic Matters Committee - Briefing
1:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
Maryland Department of Labor
Division of Unemployment Insurance

Created: 1/16/2023 4:36 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Briefing by Maryland Department of Natural Resources
Briefing by Maryland Department of Transportation

Created: 1/13/2023 10:59 AM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
2:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Del Stewart

Housing and Community Development - Whole-Home Repairs Act of 2023
Del Stewart

Housing Innovation Pilot Program and Housing Innovation Fund - Establishment (Housing Innovation Pilot Program Act of 2023)
Del Stein

Real Property - Actions for Possession - Pet Protections
Del Holmes

Ground Leases - Collection of Rent, Interest, Fees, and Other Expenses - Registration Requirements
Del Holmes

Residential Ground Leases - Redemption and Extinguishment - Requirements
Del Holmes

Ground Leases – Notices and Billing – Forms and Requirements

Created: 1/10/2023 3:37 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Procurement 101 and Cybersecurity 101

Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - (Health and Government Operations Committee)
Created: 1/27/2023 9:55 AM
Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - Work Session
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
HB 214

Created: 1/17/2023 4:01 PM
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
Del S. Johnson

Certification of Police Officers - Physical Agility Assessment - Exemption
Del Fraser-Hidalgo

Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility
Del Pippy

Criminal Law - Visual Surveillance With Prurient Intent - Private Place and Minor Victim
Del Attar

Criminal Procedure - Warrantless Arrest - Straw Purchase Participant
Del Crosby

Sexual Offenses - Crime of Violence and Lifetime Supervision
Dels Moon and Williams

Controlled Dangerous Substances – Volume Dealers and Drug Kingpins – Cannabis
Dels Moon and Clippinger

Criminal Law – Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practice – Repeal
Del Moon

Correctional Services - Geriatric and Medical Parole
Del Bartlett

Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Waiting Periods
(Removed - 1/30/2023 10:09 AM)

Created: 1/17/2023 10:49 AM
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Del Rosenberg

Election Law - Foreign Manufacture of Election Systems - Notification and Termination of Contract
Del Williams

Election Law - Curbside Voting - Establishment
Del Feldmark, et al

Local Public Campaign Financing - Expansion to Additional Offices
(Added - 1/18/2023 2:05 PM)
Del Feldmark, et al

Elections - Ballot Questions - Publication of Proposed Laws
(Added - 1/18/2023 2:05 PM)
Del Palakovich Carr, et al

Cryptocurrency - Campaign Finance Prohibitions - Disclosures by Financial Institutions
(Added - 1/19/2023 1:58 PM)
Del R. Long

Homestead Property Tax Credit – Calculation of Credit for Dwelling Purchased by First–Time Homebuyer
Del R. Long

Election Law - Absentee Ballots - Signature Requirements and Verification
Del R. Long

Elections - In-Person Voting - Proof of Identity

Other
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Created: 1/17/2023 2:07 PM
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
AIB Advisory Committee Pillar 3
Meeting Video
NOTE: The Agenda and Meeting Materials will be posted prior to the meeting. To review click here
Quarterly Meeting

Click to return on the top page