Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 3/27/2023 10:47:08 PM
Monday, March 27, 2023
Senate
Created: 3/23/2023 4:02 PM
Executive Nominations Committee
5:00 PM - Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD

Created: 3/24/2023 11:20 AM
Finance Committee - Voting Session
3:30 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Sens Feldman and Hayes

Cannabis Reform
(Jointly assigned to Finance\Budget and Taxation)

House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Maryland Medicaid Advisory Committee
Created: 3/2/2023 1:43 PM
1:00 PM to 3:00 PM - Webex-Teleconference
The meeting will be held through GotoWebinar-teleconference only.
To join online click here
TBD

No. 4 - Baltimore County
Created: 3/27/2023 11:07 AM
3:30 PM - Miller Senate Building, Schweinhaut Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
House Bills

Click to return on the top page