Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 10/21/2021 5:53:18 PM
Thursday, October 21, 2021
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Created: 10/13/2021 3:22 PM
Economic Matters Committee
9:00 AM - Site Visit
Department of Natural Resources
Multiple locations in Southern Maryland
Site Visit for Full Committee

Other
Financial Education and Capability Commission
Canceled
10:00 AM to 11:30 AM - Virtual Meeting
Email lonia@cashmd.org
to RSVP
Discuss topics related to financial education and expanding capability.

Joint Committee on Pensions
Created: 10/5/2021 3:50 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Board Requested Legislation
Briefing on State Retirement and Pension System Investing in Maryland
Briefing on Maryland Entrepreneurial Ecosystem

Maryland Community Health Resources Commission
Created: 10/18/2021 9:29 AM
4:30 PM - Meritus Medical Center, 11110 Medical Campus Road, Suite 142, Hagerstown, MD 21742
Pathways to Health Equity Information Meeting
Registration Required. To register click here
Park in Blue Lot. Enter from blue entrance.
Informational meeting to the Pathways to Health Equity Call for Proposals

Oral Health in Maryland, Task Force on
Created: 7/27/2021 8:25 AM
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
For additional information click here
Meeting of the Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland
Discussion of the task force work plan.
(Added - 10/14/2021 10:13 AM)
Presentation by MDH Acute Care Administration and Office of Oral Health.
(Added - 10/14/2021 10:13 AM)

Click to return on the top page