Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 7/30/2021 6:32:56 PM
Friday, July 30, 2021
Senate
Created: 7/26/2021 8:20 AM
Finance Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
The Finance Committee is invited to participate in the Health and Government Operations Committee briefing on the following topics:
- Medicaid reimbursement for behavioral health services delivered via telehealth
- Medicaid and administrative day rate reimbursement for adult day care

House
Created: 7/23/2021 1:01 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
The briefing agenda is available here
. Please note that this briefing will be rescheduled for a later date and time.
- Medicaid reimbursement for behavioral health services delivered via telehealth
- Medicaid and administrative day rate reimbursement for adult day care
- Developmental Disabilities Administration Appendix K changes
(Added - 7/26/2021 11:57 AM)

Other
Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings Board
Created: 7/20/2021 3:44 PM
9:00 AM to 10:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
Meeting ID: 813 7538 4837
Passcode: 918900
General Meeting and Closed Session

Click to return on the top page