Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 2/6/2023 12:27:01 PM
Thursday, December 15, 2022
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Created: 12/9/2022 12:59 PM
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Regular Board Meeting

Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports
Created: 11/3/2022 4:07 PM
12:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
Data Collection/Analysis Subcommittee
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 814 5814 5747 Passcode: 953584 Dial-In #: 301-715-8592
Meeting of the Data Collection/Analysis Subcommittee of the Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports.

No. 5 - Howard County
Canceled
7:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Meeting of the Howard County Senate and House Delegations

Spending Affordability Committee
Created: 11/14/2022 9:08 AM
3:00 PM - Location-TBD
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Decision Meeting

Click to return on the top page