Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 2/6/2023 12:00:51 PM
Thursday, November 17, 2022
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Created: 11/4/2022 1:42 PM
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Discussion of the Draft Blueprint Comprehensive Implementation Plan

Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports
Created: 11/3/2022 2:53 PM
12:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
Data Collection/Analysis Subcommittee
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 814 5814 5747 Passcode: 953584 Dial-In # 301-715-8592

Maryland Medicaid Advisory Committee
Created: 10/28/2022 11:42 AM
1:00 PM to 3:00 PM - Webex-Teleconference
Due to COVID-19, this meeting will be held through GotoWebinar-teleconference only. To join online click here
TBD

Click to return on the top page