Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 1/24/2022 2:58:12 PM
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Created: 10/20/2021 3:00 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
--Report from the State Board of Dental Examiners on its Disciplinary Process and Actions

Other
Aging, Maryland Commission on
Created: 11/8/2021 9:38 AM
10:00 AM to 12:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
For registration information click here
Regularly scheduled meeting

Assessment and Funding of School Facilities, Workgroup on the
Created: 11/11/2021 6:25 PM
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Board of Public Works
Canceled
10:00 AM - Virtual/In Person Meeting
To reach livestream click here
10 AM-Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Fl, State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis (Limited Capacity)
For participation details, please contact BPW staff at email.bpw@maryland.gov
General Meeting

Click to return on the top page