Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 2/23/2024 6:34:39 PM
Thursday, November 16, 2023
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Created: 11/2/2023 8:28 AM
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
To view the video link, agenda, and meeting materials to be posted prior to the meeting click here
Board Meeting

Joint Committee on Pensions
Created: 9/11/2023 2:03 PM
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
SRPS Board Requested Legislation
Actuarial Valuation

Maryland Medicaid Advisory Committee
Created: 11/1/2023 8:36 AM
1:00 PM to 3:00 PM - Webex-Teleconference
This meeting will continue to be held through GotoWebinar-teleconference only.
To join online click here
TBD

Click to return on the top page