Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 2/6/2023 11:54:40 AM
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Aging, Maryland Commission on
Created: 10/28/2022 3:21 PM
10:00 AM to 12:00 PM - North Laurel Community Center, 9411 Whiskey Bottom Rd. Laurel, MD
Regularly Scheduled Meeting: In Person

Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Created: 11/4/2022 1:40 PM
12:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Blueprint AIB Pillar 3 Advisory Committee
Meeting Video
Discussion of the Draft Blueprint Comprehensive Implementation Plan

Board of Public Works
Created: 7/29/2022 12:50 PM
10:00 AM - Virtual/In Person Meeting
To reach the livestream link click here
10 AM-Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Fl, State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis (Limited Capacity)
For participation details, please contact BPW staff at email.bpw@maryland.gov
General Meeting

Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness
Created: 11/4/2022 12:02 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Meeting of the Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness

Joint Committee on the Management of Public Funds
Created: 8/22/2022 2:29 PM
1:00 PM - Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Update from TEDCO, MARBIDCO, and the Department of Commerce.

Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports
Created: 11/3/2022 2:41 PM
10:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
Best Practices Subcommittee
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 846 6764 0853 Passcode: 567787 Dial-In #: 301-715-8592
Meeting of the Best Practices Subcommittee of the Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports.

Sports Wagering Application Review Commission
Created: 11/14/2022 9:35 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
This is a hybrid meeting being held at the State Lottery and Gaming Agency headquarters at 1800 Washington Blvd., Baltimore, MD 21230. The meeting will be live streamed on YouTube. Part of the meeting may be closed to the public in accordance with Open Meetings Act procedures. For more details see the Commission webpage

Click to return on the top page