Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 1/24/2022 2:55:08 PM
Tuesday, November 16, 2021
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Revenues Subcommittee - (Ways and Means Committee)
Created: 10/12/2021 2:52 PM
Revenues Subcommittee - Briefing
10:00 AM to 12:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Meeting Materials
Briefing by Department of Legislative Services on evaluations of More Jobs for Marylanders, Enterprise Zone, and One Maryland Programs; briefing by Department of Commerce in response to the DLS evaluations.

Other
General Assembly Compensation Commission
Created: 11/8/2021 10:36 AM
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Click here to see the Commission webpage for more details.
Organizational Meeting
Presentation of Compensation Materials

Howard
Created: 10/18/2021 1:25 PM
7:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Howard County House and Senate Delegations
Meeting Agenda
Howard County Delegation hearing on proposed local legislation.

Maryland Community Health Resources Commission
Created: 11/12/2021 12:49 PM
10:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
Pathways to Health Equity Informational Meeting
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 936 7878 0818 Passcode: 051488
Dial-in #: 301-715-8592 Meeting ID: 936 7878 0818 Passcode: 051488
Follow-up Frequently Asked Questions Call - Pathways to Health Equity Program.

Maryland Economic Development Commission
Created: 10/27/2021 8:04 AM
11:30 AM - Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Floor State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis, MD
Updates from the Department of Commerce, TEDCO, MEDCO, and MARBICO Annual Reports; and MEDAAF Annual Industry Review.

Click to return on the top page