Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 2/6/2023 11:47:07 AM
Tuesday, November 15, 2022
Senate
Created: 9/12/2022 10:45 AM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Briefing
3:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Briefing on Forecast of Revenues and Expenditures for the Current and Upcoming Fiscal Years, Overview of the Transportation Trust Fund, State Personnel, Debt, and the Capital Budget

House
Created: 9/12/2022 12:21 PM
Appropriations Committee - Briefing
3:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Joint with the Spending Affordability Committee, Senate Budget and Taxation, and Ways and Means Committees
Briefing Agenda
Meeting Materials
Briefing on Forecast of Revenues and Expenditures for the Current and Upcoming Fiscal Years, Overview of the Transportation Trust Fund, State Personnel, Debt, and the Capital Budget

Created: 10/3/2022 12:01 PM
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
3:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Joint with the Spending Affordability Committee, Senate Budget and Taxation, and House Appropriations Committee
Briefing Agenda

Briefing Materials

Other
House Cannabis Referendum and Legalization Workgroup
Created: 11/14/2022 11:44 AM
Briefing
7:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing from Jackson Brainerd, National Conference of State Legislatures, on tax structures in other states and how those states have changed their strategies regarding the taxation of recreational cannabis to move the people from engaging with the legacy market to the legal market.

Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee
Created: 9/29/2022 7:20 AM
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Audit: State Lottery and Gaming Commission (March 2022)
(Added - 11/9/2022 8:40 AM)
Audit: Department of Human Services - Family Investment Administration (October 2022)
(Added - 11/9/2022 8:40 AM)
Audit: Maryland Department of Health - Behavioral Health Administration and Medical Care Programs Administration - Administrative Services Organization for Behavioral Health Services (October 2022)
(Added - 11/9/2022 8:40 AM)
Summary of Reports Issued and Recommended Committee Action
(Added - 11/9/2022 8:40 AM)
TBD
(Removed - 11/9/2022 8:40 AM)

Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports
Created: 11/3/2022 4:21 PM
9:30 AM - UMBC Tech Center, Main Seminar Room, 1450 S. Rolling Road, Halethorpe, MD
To participate virtually: Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 813 2001 2960 Passcode: 392845 Dial-In #: 301-715-8592
There
is no cost to attend. Members of the public wishing to attend in person are asked to register here
Meeting of the Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports.

Maryland Economic Development Commission
Canceled
12:00 PM - Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Floor State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis, MD
Updates from the Department of Commerce and the Governor's Subcabinet on Infrastructure.

Spending Affordability Committee
Created: 9/7/2022 1:16 PM
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing on Forecast of Revenues and Expenditures for the Current and Upcoming Fiscal Years, Overview of the Transportation Trust Fund, State Personnel, Debt, and the Capital Budget

Click to return on the top page