Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 1/24/2022 2:50:11 PM
Monday, November 15, 2021
Senate
Created: 10/21/2021 12:31 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee
9:00 AM - Site Visit
Site Visit to the Baltimore City Circuit Court and District Courts.

House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Anne Arundel
Created: 10/12/2021 2:13 PM
4:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Election of Officers

Created: 10/12/2021 2:14 PM
5:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Legislative Priorities/Bond Initiatives

Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Created: 11/5/2021 2:21 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Financial Education and Capability Commission
Created: 11/12/2021 3:57 PM
11:00 AM to 12:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Email Ionia@cashmd.org to RSVP.
Discuss topics related to financial education and expanding capability.

Joint Committee on Legislative Ethics
Created: 11/4/2021 11:32 AM
Work Session
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
A portion of the meeting may be closed to comply with a statutory requirement that prevents public disclosure of matters that may be discussed.
Work Session

Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission
Created: 9/20/2021 10:55 AM
3:00 PM to 5:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
6:00 PM to 8:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Legislative Redistricting

Maryland Community Health Resources Commission
Created: 11/12/2021 12:43 PM
11:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
Pathways to Health Equity Informational Meeting
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 980 3643 0030 Passcode: 035175
Dial-in #: 301-715-8592 Meeting ID: 980 3643 0030 Passcode: 035175
Presentation to the Office of Minority Health & Health Disparitities Minority Outreach and Technical Assistance Grantees regarding the Pathways to Health Equity Program.

Senate Vaccine Oversight Workgroup
Created: 11/8/2021 3:30 PM
4:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Click to return on the top page