Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 2/23/2024 6:25:10 PM
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
Senate
Canceled
Finance Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
1. Updates from Maryland Insurance Administration and Maryland Health Benefit Exchange on health insurance-related matters.
2. Briefing from Maryland Department of Health on matters relating to health occupations boards.

House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee
Created: 9/21/2023 3:36 PM
10:00 AM - Location-TBD
9:00 AM - Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Audit: Maryland Department of Health-Office of the Secretary and Other Units (October 2023).
(Added - 11/7/2023 12:04 PM)
Summary of Reports Issued and Recommended Committee Action.
(Added - 11/7/2023 12:04 PM)
Office of Legislative Audits; TBD
(Removed - 11/7/2023 12:04 PM)

Maryland Economic Development Commission
Created: 10/18/2023 4:34 PM
Overview
3:00 PM - World Trade Center, Maryland Room 21st Floor, 401 E. Pratt Street, Baltimore, MD
Updates from Department of Commerce, the Technology Development Corporation, and Maryland Economic Development Corporation.

Transparency Standards for State's Attorneys, Task Force to Study
Created: 11/2/2023 12:03 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Current Data Collection Systems

Click to return on the top page