Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 2/6/2023 11:15:28 AM
Thursday, November 10, 2022
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Created: 11/1/2022 11:29 AM
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
1:00 PM to 5:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Meeting Video
Meeting Agenda
To sign up to provide public testimony click here
Public Hearing on the Draft Blueprint Comprehensive Implementation Plan.

Public Hearing on the Draft Blueprint Comprehensive Implementation Plan.

Financial Education and Capability Commission
Created: 9/6/2022 9:37 AM
10:00 AM to 11:30 AM - Virtual Meeting
Email lonia@cashmd.org to RSVP.
Meeting to discuss various issues on financial capability.

Hall of Records Commission
Created: 9/19/2022 8:26 AM
2:00 PM - Google Meet Video Conference
Meeting Video
To Join by Phone: (US)+1 413-338-0471 PIN: 113 548 446#
Semi-annual meeting of the Hall of Records Commission

Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports
Created: 10/6/2022 4:48 PM
12:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
Data Collection/Analysis Subcommittee
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 814 5814 5747 Passcode: 953584 Dial-In #: 301-715-8592
Meeting of the Data Collection/Analysis Subcommittee of the Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports

Created: 11/3/2022 2:48 PM
2:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
Outreach Subcommittee
Meeting Video

Meeting ID: 862 5794 8963 Passcode: 698687 Dial-In 301-715-8592
Witnesses may sign up here

School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Created: 10/26/2022 2:45 PM
9:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
To watch the livestream, click here then click on "Stream" under the appropriate date
Additional meeting information will be available at https://mdschoolschoolconstruction.org
Public virtual meeting to discuss normal IAC business.

Click to return on the top page