Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 1/24/2022 2:34:39 PM
Wednesday, November 10, 2021
Senate
Created: 10/4/2021 12:49 PM
Budget and Taxation Committee
10:00 AM - Site Visit
All day site visit to Morgan State University and Tradepoint Atlantic at Sparrows Point.

House
Created: 10/20/2021 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
School Bus Driver Shortages, School Bus Routes, and Electric School Bus Vehicles

Created: 10/20/2021 4:15 PM
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Other
Criminal Sentencing Policy, State Commission On
Created: 9/16/2021 12:31 PM
5:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
The Commission will continue the review and evaluation of the State's sentencing guidelines and policies.

Joint Committee on Children, Youth, and Families
Created: 10/28/2021 12:46 PM
Briefing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefings on the impacts of the COVID-19 pandemic on child care in Maryland.

Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission
Created: 9/20/2021 10:49 AM
6:00 PM to 8:00 PM - Remote Stream Location / YouTube
Howard County Redistricting Hearing
Howard Community College, Monteabaro Recital Hall of the Horowitz Visual and Performing Arts Center,10901 Little Patuxent Parkway, Columbia, MD 21044
Meeting Agenda
Meeting Material #1
Meeting Material #2
Guidelines for Public Hearings and Submission of Testimony and Plans
Legislative Redistricting

Maryland Community Health Resources Commission
Created: 11/8/2021 1:43 PM
10:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
Pathways to Health Equity Informational Meeting
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 995 2630 8888 Passcode: 097292
Dial-in #: 301-715-8592 Meeting ID: 995 2630 8888 Passcaode: 097292
Additional opportunity for members of the public to ask questions regarding the Pathways to Health Equity Call for Proposals. CHRC will also respond to any follow-up questions from participants from the November 9 meeting at the College of Southern Maryland.

Quality Care in Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities, Oversight Committee on
Created: 7/20/2021 4:12 PM
1:00 PM to 3:00 PM - Google Meet Video Conference
Meeting Video
To join by phone, please dial: +1 318-531-1076
PIN: 957 374 392
Regularly Scheduled Meeting

Click to return on the top page