Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 2/23/2024 6:27:10 PM
Tuesday, November 7, 2023
Senate
Created: 10/19/2023 3:41 PM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Briefing on Forecast of Revenues and Expenditures for the Current and Upcoming Fiscal Years, Overview of the Transportation Trust Fund, State Personnel, Debt, and the Capital Budget

House
Created: 11/3/2023 11:43 AM
Appropriations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting

Meeting Materials

Joint with the Spending Affordability Committee and the Senate Budget and Taxation and Ways and Means Committees

Created: 11/6/2023 9:57 AM
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Joint with the Spending Affordability Committee, the Senate Budget & Taxation Committee, and the House Appropriations Committee
Meeting Materials

Other
Hall of Records Commission
Created: 10/2/2023 7:19 AM
2:00 PM to 3:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Meeting Video
To Join by phone: (US)+1 336-914-1107 PIN: 715 398 062#
Semi-annual meeting of the Hall of Records Commission.

Joint Committee on the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area
Created: 10/12/2023 7:58 AM
9:15 AM - Chesapeake Environmental Center, 600 Discovery Lane, Grasonville, MD
Program Overview and Emerging Issues
(Added - 11/6/2023 12:52 PM)
To be determined
(Removed - 11/6/2023 12:52 PM)

Program Approval Process Workgroup
Canceled
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube

Spending Affordability Committee
Created: 8/8/2023 12:06 PM
Briefing
Wednesday, November 8, 2023 1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Joint with Senate Budget and Taxation Committee, House Appropriations, and Ways and Means Committees
Meeting Agenda
Meeting Materials
Briefing on Forecast of Revenues and Expenditures for the Current and Upcoming Fiscal Years, Overview of the Transportation Trust Fund, State Personnel, Debt, and the Capital Budget.

Click to return on the top page